Oleksandr Mykolayovych Kucher (Ukrainian: Олександр Миколайович Кучер; born 22 October 1982) is a Ukrainian former professional footballer and current manager of Ukrainian club Dnipro-1. He was a powerful defender who was good in the air and provided good coverage in the back. He could also play as … Meer weergeven Kucher started his career with Youth Academy alumnus "Athlete" Kyiv and Arsenal Kyiv, playing 59 times and scoring 5 goals. He joined Metalurh Donetsk in 2002, spending a season on loan at Arsenal Kharkiv Meer weergeven Shakhtar Donetsk • Vyshcha Liha/Ukrainian Premier League: 2007–08, 2009–10, 2010–11, 2011–12, 2012–13, 2013–14, 2016–17 • Ukrainian Cup: 2007–08, 2010–11, 2011–12, 2012–13, 2015–16, 2016–17 Meer weergeven Kucher made his debut for the Ukraine national team on 15 August 2006 in a 6–0 friendly victory over Azerbaijan. He scored his first goal for Ukraine on 11 October 2006 in a 2–0 Euro 2008 qualifying match victory over Scotland. He was part of Ukraine's … Meer weergeven • Oleksandr Kucher at UAF and archived FFU page (in Ukrainian) • Oleksandr Kucher at Soccerway • Official site Oleksandr Kucher Meer weergeven
Oleksandr Kucher Manager profiel en live statistieken updates
WebOleksandr Kucher is the 6,268th most popular soccer player (down from 5,790th in 2024), the 855th most popular biography from Ukraine (down from 731st in 2024) and the 64th … Web15 aug. 2006 · Oleksandr Kucher 1 7 6 5 Retired Last club: FK Metal Most games for: Shakhtar D. Retired since: Oct 6, 2024 www.fckarpaty.lviv.ua + Date of birth/Age: Oct 22, … new wave echo charters
Biography of O. Kucher BeSoccer
Danylo Olehovych Kucher (Ukrainian: Данило Олегович Кучер; born 25 January 1997) is a Ukrainian professional footballer who plays as a goalkeeper for Liga I club UTA Arad. WebCarriera Club. È cresciuto nelle giovanili dell'Arsenal Charkiv, squadra in cui ha militato dal 2000 al 2002 collezionando 59 presenze e 5 gol. Nel 2002 passa al Metalurh Donetsk … WebFlorian Kucher Karriereende Letzter Verein: HSV Klagenfurt Karriereende seit: 01.01.2016 mike atcheson